THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:18:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 699-7775
Fax: (416) 699-7766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sian Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong (CPSO#: 74836 )
Business Address: 1871 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1J3
416-699-7775

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 699-7775
Fax: (416) 699-7766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sian Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong (CPSO#: 74836 )
Business Address: 1871 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1J3
416-699-7775

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIAN EUNICE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIAN EUNICE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000