THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:04:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7-8405 Financial Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-846-2299
Fax: 289-720-2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roy K. T. Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mathew (CPSO#: 74843 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7-8405 Financial Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-846-2299
Fax: 289-720-2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roy K. T. Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mathew (CPSO#: 74843 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROY KUNTHARAYIL THOMAS MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROY KUNTHARAYIL THOMAS MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000