THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:38:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: Macdonald, Kathryn Anne (Used Until: 12 Jun 2000)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5155

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Nov 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Shufelt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shufelt (CPSO#: 74862 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

General Information

Former Name: Macdonald, Kathryn Anne (Used Until: 12 Jun 2000)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5155

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Nov 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Shufelt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shufelt (CPSO#: 74862 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANNE SHUFELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUFELT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANNE SHUFELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUFELT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000