THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:23:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Rue Chamberland
Rockland Ontario K4K 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Address: 1980 Trim Rd
Orléans ON K4A 5L5
Phone: 613-907-9200
Fax: 343-880-3922
Address: Unite de Recherche CM
Universit‚ d'Ottawa
200, Lees Avenue, Bloc/building E,
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 562-5800
Extension: 7368
Fax: (613) 562-5291
Address: Division of Prevention & Rehab
40 Ruskin St.
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: (613) 729-8290

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Genevieve Leroux Médecine Société Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Leroux (CPSO#: 74877 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Rue Chamberland
Rockland Ontario K4K 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Address: 1980 Trim Rd
Orléans ON K4A 5L5
Phone: 613-907-9200
Fax: 343-880-3922
Address: Unite de Recherche CM
Universit‚ d'Ottawa
200, Lees Avenue, Bloc/building E,
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 562-5800
Extension: 7368
Fax: (613) 562-5291
Address: Division of Prevention & Rehab
40 Ruskin St.
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: (613) 729-8290

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Genevieve Leroux Médecine Société Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Leroux (CPSO#: 74877 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE LEROUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEROUX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE LEROUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEROUX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000