THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:33:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Respirology
Department of Medicine
102 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2384
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Address: Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Queen's University
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Phone: 6135482384
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston Respiratory Services
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E4
Phone: 6135447910
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8 Richmond Park Drive
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Phone: 613-548-2384
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Parker (CPSO#: 74889 )
Business Address: 102 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
613-548-2384

Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Respirology
Department of Medicine
102 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2384
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Address: Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Queen's University
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Phone: 6135482384
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston Respiratory Services
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E4
Phone: 6135447910
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8 Richmond Park Drive
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Phone: 613-548-2384
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Parker (CPSO#: 74889 )
Business Address: 102 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
613-548-2384

Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000