THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NYGH Outpatient & Community Service
Centre
2 Champagne Dr, Unit E8, room 107
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Extension: 8712
Fax: (416) 7566318
Address: North York General Hospital
General Division
Mental Health Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Gelber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gelber (CPSO#: 74896 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
General Division
Mental Health Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6655
Business Address: Mental Health Department
North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West Room South 1-103
North York Ontario M2R 1N5
(416) 633-9420
Business Address: 2 Champagne Dr
unit E8
room 107
North York ON M3J 0K2
4167566000 Extn: 8712

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NYGH Outpatient & Community Service
Centre
2 Champagne Dr, Unit E8, room 107
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Extension: 8712
Fax: (416) 7566318
Address: North York General Hospital
General Division
Mental Health Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Gelber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gelber (CPSO#: 74896 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
General Division
Mental Health Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6655
Business Address: Mental Health Department
North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West Room South 1-103
North York Ontario M2R 1N5
(416) 633-9420
Business Address: 2 Champagne Dr
unit E8
room 107
North York ON M3J 0K2
4167566000 Extn: 8712

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN GEOFFREY GELBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELBER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN GEOFFREY GELBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELBER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000