THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:48:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
2nd Floor - Forensics
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-722-6521
Extension: 6976
Fax: 613-798-2992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Booth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Booth (CPSO#: 74902 )
Business Address: 2nd Floor Forensics
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 6120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
2nd Floor - Forensics
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-722-6521
Extension: 6976
Fax: 613-798-2992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Booth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Booth (CPSO#: 74902 )
Business Address: 2nd Floor Forensics
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 6120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY DAVID BOOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY DAVID BOOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000