THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:29:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: 905-773-1325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 06 Nov 2019
Summary:
On November 6, 2019, Mackenzie Health notified the College, pursuant to s.33(a) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective September 26, 2019 Dr. Tenn-Lyn’s privileges at Mackenzie Health were temporarily suspended, and effective October 10, 2019 Dr. Tenn-Lyn’s privileges were revoked. 

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole A. Tenn-Lyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tenn-Lyn (CPSO#: 74908 )
Business Address: 13291 Yonge Street, Suite 100
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Address: Mackenzie Health Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: 905-773-1325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 06 Nov 2019
Summary:
On November 6, 2019, Mackenzie Health notified the College, pursuant to s.33(a) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective September 26, 2019 Dr. Tenn-Lyn’s privileges at Mackenzie Health were temporarily suspended, and effective October 10, 2019 Dr. Tenn-Lyn’s privileges were revoked. 

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole A. Tenn-Lyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tenn-Lyn (CPSO#: 74908 )
Business Address: 13291 Yonge Street, Suite 100
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Address: Mackenzie Health Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ANDREA TENN-LYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENN-LYN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ANDREA TENN-LYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENN-LYN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Aug 2019
Summary:
As from August 26, 2020, Dr. Tenn-Lyn has completed the requirements of her SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Aug 2019
Summary:
As from August 26, 2020, Dr. Tenn-Lyn has completed the requirements of her SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 
 

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000