THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:53:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 528-5480
Fax: (905) 528-2884
Address: 2250 Bovaird Dr. E
Suite 602
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joesph's Hospital
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Steen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Steen (CPSO#: 74910 )
Business Address: 2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
4168494595
Business Address: Grant River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2W6
(519) 742-3611
Business Address: Brampton Women's Clinic
602 - 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 789-7474
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Dundurn Medical
160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4K3
(905) 528-5480

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 528-5480
Fax: (905) 528-2884
Address: 2250 Bovaird Dr. E
Suite 602
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joesph's Hospital
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Steen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Steen (CPSO#: 74910 )
Business Address: 2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
4168494595
Business Address: Grant River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2W6
(519) 742-3611
Business Address: Brampton Women's Clinic
602 - 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 789-7474
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Dundurn Medical
160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4K3
(905) 528-5480

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA EVANS STEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA EVANS STEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000