THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-105 Clappison Avenue
Waterdown Ontario L8B0Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 689-3301
Fax: (905) 689-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Desbois Medicine Professonal Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Desbois (CPSO#: 74918 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-105 Clappison Avenue
Waterdown Ontario L8B0Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 689-3301
Fax: (905) 689-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Desbois Medicine Professonal Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Desbois (CPSO#: 74918 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE ANNICK DESBOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESBOIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE ANNICK DESBOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESBOIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000