THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:31:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can fax their request to: 905-527-7006 to the Attention of Paul Wojeiechowski.
Date Received: 28 Feb 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bronislaw L. Golda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chomej (CPSO#: 74923 ) Dr. B. Golda (CPSO#: 51431 )
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Pky
Unit #2B
Stoney Creek ON L8J 3W2
(905)527-7099

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can fax their request to: 905-527-7006 to the Attention of Paul Wojeiechowski.
Date Received: 28 Feb 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bronislaw L. Golda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chomej (CPSO#: 74923 ) Dr. B. Golda (CPSO#: 51431 )
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Pky
Unit #2B
Stoney Creek ON L8J 3W2
(905)527-7099

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000