THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Anderson (CPSO#: 74927 )
Business Address: Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Anderson (CPSO#: 74927 )
Business Address: Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000