THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:56:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
681 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-5600
Fax: (705) 268-7244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerard Champion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Champion (CPSO#: 74942 )
Business Address: 1-681 Algonquin Blvd E
Timmins ON P4N 8S6
7053637137

Corporation Name: Gerard Champion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
681 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-5600
Fax: (705) 268-7244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerard Champion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Champion (CPSO#: 74942 )
Business Address: 1-681 Algonquin Blvd E
Timmins ON P4N 8S6
7053637137

Corporation Name: Gerard Champion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GERARD CHAMPION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPION is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GERARD CHAMPION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPION is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000