THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 327-9188
Fax: (705) 327-9189
Address: Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N8P2
Phone: 7052672131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Barker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Barker (CPSO#: 74943 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 327-9188

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 327-9188
Fax: (705) 327-9189
Address: Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N8P2
Phone: 7052672131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Barker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Barker (CPSO#: 74943 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 327-9188

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JANE BARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JANE BARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000