THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Extension: 2305
Fax: (905) 773-1325
Address: Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leventis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Leventis (CPSO#: 74948 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: 100 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7759

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Extension: 2305
Fax: (905) 773-1325
Address: Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leventis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Leventis (CPSO#: 74948 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: 100 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7759

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIOS LEVENTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENTIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIOS LEVENTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENTIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000