THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:57:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: Parsons-Sheldrake, Jeffrey Richard (Used Until: 15 Sep 2022)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 653-1140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parsons-Sheldrake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. DeLuca-Sheldrake (CPSO#: 74957 )
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140

General Information

Former Name: Parsons-Sheldrake, Jeffrey Richard (Used Until: 15 Sep 2022)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 653-1140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parsons-Sheldrake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. DeLuca-Sheldrake (CPSO#: 74957 )
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY DELUCA-SHELDRAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELUCA-SHELDRAKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY DELUCA-SHELDRAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELUCA-SHELDRAKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Mar 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Mar 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000