THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 9
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-9199
Fax: (705) 523-9197

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Sbrocchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sbrocchi (CPSO#: 74958 )
Business Address: Unit 9
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 523-9199
Business Address: 935 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 675-4883
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Sbrocchi and Dr. Andre Michon Medici
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Oct 2009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 9
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-9199
Fax: (705) 523-9197

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Sbrocchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sbrocchi (CPSO#: 74958 )
Business Address: Unit 9
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 523-9199
Business Address: 935 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 675-4883
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Sbrocchi and Dr. Andre Michon Medici
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Oct 2009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CLARE SBROCCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SBROCCHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CLARE SBROCCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SBROCCHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000