THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:54:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1380 Upper Canada St
Kanata ON K2T 0N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-599-5000
Fax: 343-599-5001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Kujavsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kujavsky (CPSO#: 74989 )
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata Ontario K2M 1P6
(613) 599-3321
Business Address: 205-1380 Upper Canada St
Kanata ON K2T 0N7
343-599-5000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1380 Upper Canada St
Kanata ON K2T 0N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-599-5000
Fax: 343-599-5001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Kujavsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kujavsky (CPSO#: 74989 )
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata Ontario K2M 1P6
(613) 599-3321
Business Address: 205-1380 Upper Canada St
Kanata ON K2T 0N7
343-599-5000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STEPHEN KUJAVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUJAVSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STEPHEN KUJAVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUJAVSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000