THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:22:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 226-2777
Fax: (416) 226-2771
Address: Kensington Cancer Screening Centre
340 College Street, Suite 601
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 226-2777
Fax: (416) 226-2771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bookman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bookman (CPSO#: 75007 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 226-2777
Business Address: 601 - 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-9511

Corporation Name: Ian Bookman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Dec 2009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 226-2777
Fax: (416) 226-2771
Address: Kensington Cancer Screening Centre
340 College Street, Suite 601
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 226-2777
Fax: (416) 226-2771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bookman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bookman (CPSO#: 75007 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 226-2777
Business Address: 601 - 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-9511

Corporation Name: Ian Bookman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Dec 2009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN DAVID BOOKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOKMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN DAVID BOOKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOKMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000