THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:28:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
CKD Clinic
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055085911
Fax: 9055082972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prince Aujla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Aujla (CPSO#: 75013 )
Business Address: MacKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Level 2
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Suite 205
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 508-5911
Business Address: Suite 101
Building A
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
CKD Clinic
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055085911
Fax: 9055082972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prince Aujla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Aujla (CPSO#: 75013 )
Business Address: MacKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Level 2
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Suite 205
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 508-5911
Business Address: Suite 101
Building A
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRINCE SARABSUKHJIT SINGH AUJLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUJLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRINCE SARABSUKHJIT SINGH AUJLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUJLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000