THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:54:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-338-4651
Fax: 905-338-4146
Address: 2951 WALKERS LINE
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: 9055922301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avtar Sohal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sohal (CPSO#: 75022 )
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-2301
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4618

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-338-4651
Fax: 905-338-4146
Address: 2951 WALKERS LINE
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: 9055922301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avtar Sohal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sohal (CPSO#: 75022 )
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-2301
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4618

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVTAR SINGH SOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVTAR SINGH SOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000