THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Department of Anesthesia
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Coombes, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Coombes (CPSO#: 75028 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-6856

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Department of Anesthesia
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Coombes, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Coombes (CPSO#: 75028 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-6856

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBIN DENEYS COOMBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOMBES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBIN DENEYS COOMBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOMBES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000