THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:06:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gervais-Fagnou, Danielle Denette (Used Until: 26 Aug 2013)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-216 Rideau Street
ByWard Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Address: 1582 Bank St
The Health Clinic
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z5
Phone: 613-248-2226
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Gervais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gervais (CPSO#: 75041 )

General Information

Former Name: Gervais-Fagnou, Danielle Denette (Used Until: 26 Aug 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-216 Rideau Street
ByWard Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Address: 1582 Bank St
The Health Clinic
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z5
Phone: 613-248-2226
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Gervais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gervais (CPSO#: 75041 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE DENETTE GERVAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERVAIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE DENETTE GERVAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERVAIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000