THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:36:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: Wong, Anita Betsy (Used Until: 01 Oct 2006)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 286-3830
Fax: (416) 286-3133

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anita Mo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mo (CPSO#: 75048 )
Business Address: 140 - 1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
(416) 286-3830

General Information

Former Name: Wong, Anita Betsy (Used Until: 01 Oct 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 286-3830
Fax: (416) 286-3133

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anita Mo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mo (CPSO#: 75048 )
Business Address: 140 - 1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
(416) 286-3830

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA BETSY MO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA BETSY MO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000