THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:15:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Aurora Family Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807)285-1894
Fax: (807)285-2098

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason A Shack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shack (CPSO#: 75055 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: Aurora Family Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6L9
(807) 285-1897

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Aurora Family Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807)285-1894
Fax: (807)285-2098

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason A Shack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shack (CPSO#: 75055 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: Aurora Family Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6L9
(807) 285-1897

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ALAN SHACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHACK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ALAN SHACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHACK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000