THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:25:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 6255
Fax: (905) 813-3042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Raha (CPSO#: 75056 )
Business Address: Milton Diagnostic Services
480 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9A9
(905) 878-8831
Business Address: Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 828-0653
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 259-6671
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 5776
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 6255
Fax: (905) 813-3042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Raha (CPSO#: 75056 )
Business Address: Milton Diagnostic Services
480 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9A9
(905) 878-8831
Business Address: Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 828-0653
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 259-6671
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 5776
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONJON NEIL RAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONJON NEIL RAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000