THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 401
3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 256-9500
Fax: (416) 256-9522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Medad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Medad (CPSO#: 75069 )
Business Address: Gastroenterology Group
505 - 3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B2
(416) 256-9500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 401
3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 256-9500
Fax: (416) 256-9522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Medad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Medad (CPSO#: 75069 )
Business Address: Gastroenterology Group
505 - 3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B2
(416) 256-9500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILAN EMMANUEL MEDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEDAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILAN EMMANUEL MEDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEDAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000