THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:28:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Park Medical Centre
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville Ontario L6H 6W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 257-1006
Fax: (905) 257-9141
Address: 135-690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V3
Phone: 9058441751
Fax: 9059011633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sabrina Ing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ing (CPSO#: 75075 )
Business Address: Oak Park Medical Centre
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville Ontario L6H 6W5
(905) 257-1006

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Park Medical Centre
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville Ontario L6H 6W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 257-1006
Fax: (905) 257-9141
Address: 135-690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V3
Phone: 9058441751
Fax: 9059011633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sabrina Ing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ing (CPSO#: 75075 )
Business Address: Oak Park Medical Centre
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville Ontario L6H 6W5
(905) 257-1006

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABRINA YUN ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABRINA YUN ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000