THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:19:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9135 Keele Street
Unit A5
Vaughan Ontario L4K0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 200 Fletcher Cresc.,
2nd Floor eye clinic
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 350 Rutherford Rd.,S
Suite 300 Plaza 2
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731
Address: 2855 Markham Rd
Suite 408
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Sinai Health System Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Baseer U. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khan (CPSO#: 75084 )
Business Address: Suite 300, Plaza ll
350 Rutherford Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: 705 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: A5 - 9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Business Address: 300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Toronto Ontario M1V 3Z3
(416) 663-3937

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9135 Keele Street
Unit A5
Vaughan Ontario L4K0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 200 Fletcher Cresc.,
2nd Floor eye clinic
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 350 Rutherford Rd.,S
Suite 300 Plaza 2
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731
Address: 2855 Markham Rd
Suite 408
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Sinai Health System Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Baseer U. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khan (CPSO#: 75084 )
Business Address: Suite 300, Plaza ll
350 Rutherford Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: 705 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: A5 - 9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Business Address: 300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Toronto Ontario M1V 3Z3
(416) 663-3937

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASEER UDDIN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASEER UDDIN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000