THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kennedy Medical Centre
4A - 2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 459-4385
Fax: (905) 459-6373
Address: Peel Memorial Centre
William Osler Health System
20 Lynch Street, Brampton, ON
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 22552
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 56516
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Banerjee Goel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Banerjee (CPSO#: 75085 ) Dr. S. Goel (CPSO#: 71460 )
Business Address: Wise Elephant Family Health
4A- 2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P6
(905) 459-4385
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre
Peel Memorial Hospital
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kennedy Medical Centre
4A - 2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 459-4385
Fax: (905) 459-6373
Address: Peel Memorial Centre
William Osler Health System
20 Lynch Street, Brampton, ON
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 22552
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 56516
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Banerjee Goel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Banerjee (CPSO#: 75085 ) Dr. S. Goel (CPSO#: 71460 )
Business Address: Wise Elephant Family Health
4A- 2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P6
(905) 459-4385
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre
Peel Memorial Hospital
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOPITA BANERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOPITA BANERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000