THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:08:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
1295 Riverbend Rd
London Ontario N6K 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Fax: (519) 432-2566
Address: Suite 233
355 Wellington St
London Ontario N6A 3N7
Phone: 519-432-1919
Fax: 519-432-2566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sylvia Murchison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murchison (CPSO#: 75088 )
Business Address: 233 - 355 Wellington Street
London Ontario N6A 3N7
(519) 432-1919
Business Address: 1295 Riverbend Road
Suite 200
London Ontario N6K 0G2
(519) 432-1919 Extn: 224

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
1295 Riverbend Rd
London Ontario N6K 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Fax: (519) 432-2566
Address: Suite 233
355 Wellington St
London Ontario N6A 3N7
Phone: 519-432-1919
Fax: 519-432-2566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sylvia Murchison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murchison (CPSO#: 75088 )
Business Address: 233 - 355 Wellington Street
London Ontario N6A 3N7
(519) 432-1919
Business Address: 1295 Riverbend Road
Suite 200
London Ontario N6K 0G2
(519) 432-1919 Extn: 224

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYLVIA AMELIA MURCHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURCHISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYLVIA AMELIA MURCHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURCHISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000