THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:59:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 551 Knight's Hill Road
Unit 3
London, Ontario
N6J 3A1
London Ontario N6J 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 668-0491
Fax: (519) 668-1942

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Wiebe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wiebe (CPSO#: 75092 )
Business Address: 2-551 Knight's Hill Road
London Ontario N6J 3A1
(519) 668-1485

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 551 Knight's Hill Road
Unit 3
London, Ontario
N6J 3A1
London Ontario N6J 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 668-0491
Fax: (519) 668-1942

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Wiebe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wiebe (CPSO#: 75092 )
Business Address: 2-551 Knight's Hill Road
London Ontario N6J 3A1
(519) 668-1485

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA JOY WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA JOY WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000