THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 250
2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 726-3263
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phillip Inouye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Inouye (CPSO#: 75103 )
Business Address: 250 - 2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
(613) 726-3263

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 250
2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 726-3263
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phillip Inouye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Inouye (CPSO#: 75103 )
Business Address: 250 - 2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
(613) 726-3263

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILLIP KINJI INOUYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INOUYE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILLIP KINJI INOUYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INOUYE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000