THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 First Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 2C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 943-0712
Fax: (519) 943-0284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Mori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mori (CPSO#: 75122 )
Business Address: 24 First Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 2C7
(519) 943-0712

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 First Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 2C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 943-0712
Fax: (519) 943-0284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Mori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mori (CPSO#: 75122 )
Business Address: 24 First Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 2C7
(519) 943-0712

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KIYOSHI MORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KIYOSHI MORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000