THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Higgins (CPSO#: 75132 )
Business Address: Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-9940

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Higgins (CPSO#: 75132 )
Business Address: Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-9940

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE JANE HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE JANE HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000