THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:42:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Grenier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Grenier (CPSO#: 75142 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 858-7600
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6004

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Grenier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Grenier (CPSO#: 75142 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 858-7600
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6004

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIE MARGUERITE GRENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRENIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIE MARGUERITE GRENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRENIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000