THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:47:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iglesias Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Iglesias (CPSO#: 75153 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
Unit C3 111
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iglesias Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Iglesias (CPSO#: 75153 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
Unit C3 111
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 06 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. IVAN RAMON IGLESIAS may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. IVAN RAMON IGLESIAS may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000