THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:57:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yale University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Gynecologic Oncology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 576 8711
Extension: 34808
Fax: 905-721-7784

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie-Ann Francis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Francis (CPSO#: 75161 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 4808
Business Address: 795 Gardiners Road
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Yale University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Gynecologic Oncology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 576 8711
Extension: 34808
Fax: 905-721-7784

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie-Ann Francis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Francis (CPSO#: 75161 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 4808
Business Address: 795 Gardiners Road
Kingston Ontario K7M 7E6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE-ANN RONELLE FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE-ANN RONELLE FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yale University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000