THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:55:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grey Bruce Health Sevices
Department of Ophthalmology
Suite 7213
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: (519) 376-7160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hesham Sherif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sherif (CPSO#: 75177 )
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Department of Ophthalmology - Suite 7213
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grey Bruce Health Sevices
Department of Ophthalmology
Suite 7213
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: (519) 376-7160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hesham Sherif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sherif (CPSO#: 75177 )
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Department of Ophthalmology - Suite 7213
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HESHAM A SHERIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERIF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HESHAM A SHERIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERIF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000