THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:42:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 237-4901
Fax: (905) 237-4906

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 29 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gallimore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gallimore (CPSO#: 75180 )
Business Address: Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V7
(905) 237-4901

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 237-4901
Fax: (905) 237-4906

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 29 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gallimore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gallimore (CPSO#: 75180 )
Business Address: Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V7
(905) 237-4901

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HUGH GALLIMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLIMORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HUGH GALLIMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLIMORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Jan 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000