THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:02:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-7770
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Taibu Community Health Centre
27 Tapscott Road
Unit #1
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth C. Layne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Layne (CPSO#: 75181 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-7770
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Taibu Community Health Centre
27 Tapscott Road
Unit #1
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth C. Layne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Layne (CPSO#: 75181 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CLEOPATRA LAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAYNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CLEOPATRA LAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAYNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000