THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 12:27:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
39 Campus Trail
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624
Address: 10 Howland Drive
Unit 1
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1M3
Phone: 7057897600
Fax: 7057891509

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Harrold and Richard Trenholm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Harrold (CPSO#: 73661 ) Dr. R. Trenholm (CPSO#: 75187 )
Business Address: 39 Campus Trail
Huntsville Ontario P1H 0E5
705-788-3623
Business Address: Suite 202
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(708) 788-3623

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
39 Campus Trail
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624
Address: 10 Howland Drive
Unit 1
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1M3
Phone: 7057897600
Fax: 7057891509

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Harrold and Richard Trenholm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Harrold (CPSO#: 73661 ) Dr. R. Trenholm (CPSO#: 75187 )
Business Address: 39 Campus Trail
Huntsville Ontario P1H 0E5
705-788-3623
Business Address: Suite 202
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(708) 788-3623

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD LOCKSLEY TRENHOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRENHOLM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD LOCKSLEY TRENHOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRENHOLM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000