THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:15:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Cardiorespitory Department
Room N2916
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6221
Fax: (905) 494-6717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayraj Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ahmad (CPSO#: 75192 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Cardiorespiratory Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Cardiorespitory Department
Room N2916
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6221
Fax: (905) 494-6717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayraj Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ahmad (CPSO#: 75192 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Cardiorespiratory Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYRAJ AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYRAJ AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000