THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-453-0715
Fax: 905-453-0972
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
L6R 3J7
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Steet
Brampton, ON
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 34567
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xi Shan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Shan (CPSO#: 75197 )
Business Address: 102-157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Address: Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N5
(905) 453-0715
Business Address: 157 Queen St E
Unit 102
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
905-453-0715

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-453-0715
Fax: 905-453-0972
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
L6R 3J7
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Steet
Brampton, ON
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 34567
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xi Shan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Shan (CPSO#: 75197 )
Business Address: 102-157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Address: Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4N5
(905) 453-0715
Business Address: 157 Queen St E
Unit 102
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
905-453-0715

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XI SHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XI SHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000