THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maitland Valley Medical Clinic
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Address: Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 515 Seabreeze Drive
Southbridge Nursing Home
Goderich Ontario N7A 3X8
Phone: 226-421-3060
Fax: 226-421-3065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spacek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spacek (CPSO#: 75204 ) Dr. K. Spacek (CPSO#: 74874 )
Business Address: 290 South Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 4G6
(519) 524-7324
Business Address: 120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8323
Business Address: Goderich Medical Clinic
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
(519) 524-6060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maitland Valley Medical Clinic
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Address: Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 515 Seabreeze Drive
Southbridge Nursing Home
Goderich Ontario N7A 3X8
Phone: 226-421-3060
Fax: 226-421-3065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spacek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spacek (CPSO#: 75204 ) Dr. K. Spacek (CPSO#: 74874 )
Business Address: 290 South Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 4G6
(519) 524-7324
Business Address: 120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8323
Business Address: Goderich Medical Clinic
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
(519) 524-6060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STAN ZDENEK SPACEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPACEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STAN ZDENEK SPACEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPACEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000