THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:00:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 King's College Circle, Room 3157
University of Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-4543
Fax: (888) 922-6466

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Law (CPSO#: 75211 )
Business Address: 3157 - 1 King's College Circle
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A8
(416) 978-4543

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 King's College Circle, Room 3157
University of Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-4543
Fax: (888) 922-6466

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Law (CPSO#: 75211 )
Business Address: 3157 - 1 King's College Circle
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A8
(416) 978-4543

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000