THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:44:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Ctr of Southeastern Ontario
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Robinson (CPSO#: 75214 )
Business Address: 201 Bridge Street West
Napanee Ontario K7R 2E5

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Ctr of Southeastern Ontario
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Robinson (CPSO#: 75214 )
Business Address: 201 Bridge Street West
Napanee Ontario K7R 2E5

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW GEORGE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW GEORGE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000