THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:51:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Extension: 2214
Fax: (519) 941-4707
Address: Chartwell Aurora
32 Mill Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 2R9
Phone: (905) 727-1939
Fax: 905-727-6299
Address: River Glen Haven
160 High Street
Sutton Ontario L0E 1R0
Phone: 905-722-8638
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig Donaldson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Donaldson (CPSO#: 75224 )
Business Address: Chartwell Aurora Long Term Care Residence
32 Mill Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 2R9
(905) 727-1939
Business Address: 160 High Street
Sutton Ontario L0E 1R0
(905) 722-3631
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Extension: 2214
Fax: (519) 941-4707
Address: Chartwell Aurora
32 Mill Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 2R9
Phone: (905) 727-1939
Fax: 905-727-6299
Address: River Glen Haven
160 High Street
Sutton Ontario L0E 1R0
Phone: 905-722-8638
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig Donaldson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Donaldson (CPSO#: 75224 )
Business Address: Chartwell Aurora Long Term Care Residence
32 Mill Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 2R9
(905) 727-1939
Business Address: 160 High Street
Sutton Ontario L0E 1R0
(905) 722-3631
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG STEPHEN DONALDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONALDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG STEPHEN DONALDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONALDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000