THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:43:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kendall-Richeson, Claire Elizabeth (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Kendall-Richeson, Claire Elizabeth (Used Until: 16 Apr 2012)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: BruyŠre Family Medicine Centre
75 BruyŠre St
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: 613-241-2755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claire Kendall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kendall (CPSO#: 75235 )
Business Address: Bruyere Academic Family Health Team
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
(613) 241-3344

General Information

Former Name: Kendall-Richeson, Claire Elizabeth (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Kendall-Richeson, Claire Elizabeth (Used Until: 16 Apr 2012)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: BruyŠre Family Medicine Centre
75 BruyŠre St
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: 613-241-2755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claire Kendall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kendall (CPSO#: 75235 )
Business Address: Bruyere Academic Family Health Team
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
(613) 241-3344

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAIRE ELIZABETH KENDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENDALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAIRE ELIZABETH KENDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENDALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000