THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5466
Fax: (416) 864-5914
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 6994
Fax: (705) 256-3491
Address: 2300 Yonge St., Suite 906
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Fam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fam (CPSO#: 75251 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Suite 6-043
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5939

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5466
Fax: (416) 864-5914
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 6994
Fax: (705) 256-3491
Address: 2300 Yonge St., Suite 906
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Fam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fam (CPSO#: 75251 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Suite 6-043
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5939

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL PETER FAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL PETER FAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000